Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Byssmann, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1434²Born
21 Jun 148248.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
21 Jun 148248.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina
7 Jul 148248.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina
1501²67.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Byssmann
Bishop André Byssmann O.S.A. (born 1434, died 1501) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrno
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBrno

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 202
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,387
  • bp/bd: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast