Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Schlecht, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Sep 1481AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
10 Sep 1481AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
23 Sep 1481Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
31 Jul 1500DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Schlecht
Bishop Johann Schlecht O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilsek

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,385
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 164
  • bp/auxb: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • bp/auxb: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast