Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis White, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Glendalough


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Oct 1481AppointedBishop of Glendalough, Ireland
9 Dec 1481Ordained BishopBishop of Glendalough, Ireland
30 May 1497ResignedBishop of Glendalough, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Denis White
Bishop Denis White O.P. , Bishop Emeritus of Glendalough

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Oct 2016