Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guidantonio Arcimboldo

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1489AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Mar 1489Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
18 Oct 1497DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guidantonio Arcimboldo
Archbishop Guidantonio Arcimboldo (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCastle, Chapel, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia
Buried Place (Original)Duomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 188
  • ob/c2+: AT, 19 Oct 2016
  • loc: AT, 2 Jan 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,489, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast