Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Ruthall

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Jun 1509AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
24 Jun 1509Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
4 Feb 1523DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Ruthall
Bishop Thomas Ruthall (died ) Bishop of Durham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCirencester
Ordained BishopYork House, Westminster

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 189
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 96
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1509, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 May 2018

Quantcast