Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Emilio Cardinal Cesi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Administrator of Civita Castellana e Orte

Administrator of Todi

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1481²BornUmbria
1 Jul 151736.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151736.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
6 Feb 152039.1AppointedAdministrator of Lund, Sweden
12 Jul 152140.5ResignedAdministrator of Lund, Sweden
12 Nov 152241.9AppointedAdministrator of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
1 Jun 152342.4AppointedAdministrator of Todi, Italy
20 May 152443.4AppointedAdministrator of Narni, Italy
1 Jun 152443.4ResignedAdministrator of Narni, Italy
1525²44.0AppointedAdministrator of Cervia, Italy
7 Apr 152544.3AppointedAdministrator of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
23 Mar 152847.2ResignedAdministrator of Cervia, Italy
8 Sep 152948.7ResignedAdministrator of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
6 Oct 152948.8AppointedAdministrator of Massa Marittima, Italy
21 Oct 153049.8ResignedAdministrator of Massa Marittima, Italy
153453.0AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
5 Sep 153453.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
5 Aug 153756.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Emilio Cesi:
Paolo Emilio Cardinal Cesi (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

  • a cardinal for 20.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 237, and Page 211
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 253, and Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Aug 2014