Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Nowodworski

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornPlock
26 Jan 161542.0AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
26 Apr 161542.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
29 Nov 162754.9AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
7 Apr 163158.2AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
26 Aug 163461.6DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adam Nowodworski:
Bishop Adam Nowodworski (died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 130, and Page 287
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 58, Number 330
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015