Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zachariasz Nowoszycki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Dec 1634AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
4 Dec 1634AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro
21 Dec 1634Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Epiro
14 Mar 1641DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Zachariasz Nowoszycki
Bishop Zachariasz Nowoszycki (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 259
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 24
  • nm/d: CB, 25 Jan 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast