Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wojciech Baranowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548BornBaranów
11 Feb 158537.1AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
23 Apr 158537.3Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
30 Jan 159143.1AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
14 May 160759.4AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
28 Jul 160860.6AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
23 Sep 161567.7DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Baranowski:
Archbishop Wojciech Baranowski (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 276, and Page 280
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,925

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014