Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni-Antonio Niccola (Nicola)

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1753Born
19 Sep 177825.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 181764.3SelectedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
16 Mar 181864.6ConfirmedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
7 Jun 181864.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
12 Jan 183480.4DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni-Antonio Niccola (Nicola)
Bishop Giovanni-Antonio Niccola (Nicola) (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmagnola

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 65
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast