Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Maria Oldo, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1671BornCrema
5 Jun 169422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
11 Feb 171846.6AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
13 Feb 171846.6Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
27 Jan 172553.5ResignedBishop of Narni, Italy
3 Mar 172553.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
3 Mar 172553.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
28 Jan 172654.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
9 Dec 172655.4AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
3 Nov 174978.3DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Maria Oldo:
Bishop Gioacchino Maria Oldo O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 148, and Page 280
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013