Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej Paweł Możdżeniewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mohilev

Titular Bishop of Akka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1747³BornJordanowicz, Poland
21 Jul 177124.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 181568.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus
10 Jul 181568.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Akka
6 May 181770.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Akka
5 Apr 181972.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mohilev, Belarus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maciej Paweł Możdżeniewski:
Bishop Maciej Paweł Możdżeniewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 57
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,032

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Sep 2014