Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valery Henryk Kamionko

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Abdera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1767³Born
31 Jul 178922.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Aug 178922.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 181548.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
10 Jul 181548.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
6 Jul 181750.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
26 Aug 184073.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valery Henryk Kamionko
Bishop Valery Henryk Kamionko (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuladowicz

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1817, Number 20
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 55
  • ob: CB, 24 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018