Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Blythe

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1493AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
23 Feb 1494Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
23 Aug 1499DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Blythe:
Bishop John Blythe (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 230
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015