Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Deane

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1440Born
13 Apr 149454.3SelectedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
4 Jul 149555.5ConfirmedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
20 Nov 149555.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
7 Dec 149959.9SelectedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
8 Jan 150060.0ConfirmedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
26 Apr 150161.3SelectedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
26 May 150161.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
15 Feb 150363.1DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Deane:
Archbishop Henry Deane (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 24, and Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 102, and Page 230
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 604
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013