Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Moriz Salazar

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554¹BornValladolid
20 Oct 160450.8AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
9 Jan 160551.0Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
5 Sep 161662.7AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
1 Jan 162874.0DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Moriz Salazar:
Bishop Juan Moriz Salazar (died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 109
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013