Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clément Graebbels (Crabeels)

Deceased

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
10 Sep 158454.6AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
13 Jan 158555.0Ordained BishopBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
22 Oct 159262.8DiedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clément Graebbels (Crabeels)
Bishop Clément Graebbels (Crabeels) (born 1530, died ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLouvain
Ordained BishopNotre Dame, Cathedral, Tournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 137
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,518
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast