Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joannes Hauchin

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1527¹Born
24 Jan 158356.0AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
30 Oct 158356.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
5 Jan 158962.0DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Hauchin (VIAF: 20557032)
Archbishop Joannes Hauchin (born 1527, died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeraardsbergen
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Tournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Death PlaceMalines

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 239
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,517
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast