Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles du Plessis d’Argentré

Deceased

Bishop of Tulle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1673BornArgentré
26 Oct 172350.4SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
18 Apr 172551.9ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
10 Jun 172552.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
27 Oct 1740²67.4DiedBishop of Tulle, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles du Plessis d’Argentré:
Bishop Charles du Plessis d’Argentré (born , died ) Bishop of Tulle

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015