Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bl. Leontiy Leonid Fedorov, M.S.U. †

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch of Russia (Russian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1879BornSt. Petersburg
22 Mar 191131.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 191131.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 191333.2ProfessedPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
28 May 191737.5SelectedApostolic Exarch of Russia (Russian)
1 Mar 192141.3ConfirmedApostolic Exarch of Russia (Russian)
7 Mar 193555.3DiedApostolic Exarch of Russia (Russian)
27 Jun 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Leontiy Leonid Fedorov:
Father Bl. Leontiy Leonid Fedorov M.S.U. (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch of Russia

  • a priest for 23.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 17 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015