Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Sperelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1639Born
21 Mar 167636.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 169859.3AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
28 Dec 169859.3Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
11 Dec 172081.3ResignedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Sperelli
Bishop Cesare Sperelli (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAssisi

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast