Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François de Sales

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹BornThorens
12 Oct 162042.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
12 Oct 162042.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Chalcedon
17 Jan 162143.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chalcedon
28 Dec 162244.9SucceededBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
8 Jun 163557.4DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de Sales:
Bishop Jean-François de Sales (died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 193, and Page 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015