Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Sperelli

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹BornAssisi
13 Sep 162132.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
13 Sep 162132.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantina
26 Sep 162132.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantina
22 Jul 163142.6SucceededBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
1646²57.0DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sperelli:
Bishop Francesco Sperelli Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 314, and Page 161
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 73, Number 428

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013