Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Klimó

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1710Born
21 Mar 173322.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 May 173323.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 175141.3SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
15 Nov 175141.5ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
5 Mar 175241.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
2 May 177767.0DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for György Klimó
Bishop György Klimó (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLopassón

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 351
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast