Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franc Jožef Mikolič (Mikolitsch)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1739Born
16 May 176122.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
10 Apr 176223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
14 Dec 178950.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
14 Dec 178950.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
23 Jan 179050.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
4 Dec 179354.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Franc Jožef Mikolič (Mikolitsch)
Bishop Franc Jožef Mikolič (Mikolitsch) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLjubljana, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,910
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 229, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast