Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Théodore Messaieh (Msayeh)

Deceased

Archbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1837¹Born
1870²33.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 190467.6AppointedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
16 Oct 190467.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
8 Jul 191780.5DiedArchbishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Théodore Messaieh (Msayeh)
Archbishop Théodore Messaieh (Msayeh) (born 1837, died ) Archbishop of Kerkūk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaghdad
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean)
Death PlaceKerkūk, Archdiocese of Kerkūk (Chaldean)

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast