Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Felice (Pietro Martire) Mercanti, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1668Born
6 May 170940.9AppointedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
25 Feb 172152.7DiedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Felice (Pietro Martire) Mercanti
Archbishop Alessandro Felice (Pietro Martire) Mercanti O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontanellato

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 282
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,642
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast