Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace Pierre VIII (Grégoire) Abdel-Ahad

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1930Born
17 Oct 195424.3Ordained PriestPriest
199160.5AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine
29 Jun 199666.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Batnae dei Siri
21 Jun 199766.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Batnae dei Siri
16 Feb 200170.6SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
16 Feb 200170.6SelectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
20 Feb 200170.6ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
20 Feb 200170.6ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
2 Feb 200877.5RetiredPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
2 Feb 200877.5RetiredBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
4 Apr 201887.7DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ignace Pierre VIII (Grégoire) Abdel-Ahad
Patriarch Ignace Pierre VIII (Grégoire) Abdel-Ahad (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l'Assomption, Cathedral, Alep
Death PlaceJerusalem, Patriarchal Exarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph, Church, Bethlehem, Patriarchal Exarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,019
  • d: CB, 4 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast