Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lodovico Martini

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹Born
31 Jan 161145.0AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
24 Feb 161145.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
10 Dec 162155.9DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Martini
Bishop Lodovico Martini (born 1566, died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNice, Diocese of Nice, France

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast