Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Maria Mantegazza (Montegazza), B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨

Titular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1745BornMilano, Italy
27 Oct 176116.5ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
28 May 176823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
25 Jun 177833.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar
25 Jun 177833.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
5 May 178035.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar
12 Nov 178641.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
4 Aug 179449.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria Mantegazza (Montegazza): VIAF:56619454
Bishop Gaetano Maria Mantegazza (Montegazza) B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 281, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1786, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016