Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Aurelio Balbis Bertone

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1725Born
22 Mar 174923.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 174924.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 175731.5AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
16 Jan 175731.6Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
17 May 178963.9DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Aurelio Balbis Bertone
Bishop Marco Aurelio Balbis Bertone (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChieri

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 314
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast