Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Maniscalco, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caltagirone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1783Born
7 Jun 180724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
20 May 184460.9SelectedBishop of Avellino, Italy
17 Jun 184461.0ConfirmedBishop of Avellino, Italy
23 Jun 184461.0Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino, Italy
28 Nov 185370.4SelectedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
7 Apr 185470.8ConfirmedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
10 Apr 185571.8DiedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Maniscalco
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Maniscalco O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Caltagirone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlessandria della Rocca
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 171, and Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017