Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Manrique de Lara

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530²Born
9 Jan 157949.0AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
29 Mar 157949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
19 Sep 159363.7DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Manrique de Lara
Bishop Jerónimo Manrique de Lara (born 1530, died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,154
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,144
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 91, Number 561
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast