Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Simancas

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1513¹Born
15 Dec 156451.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
1 Apr 156552.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
3 Dec 156855.9AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
13 Jun 157865.4AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
16 Oct 158370.7DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Simancas (VIAF: 87738742)
Bishop Diego de Simancas (born 1513, died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 18.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168, and Page 266
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,084
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 76, Number 448
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 339
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast