Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín de Córdoba Mendoza, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1512Born
17 Jul 156047.7AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
4 Jun 157461.5AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
13 Jun 157865.6AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
5 Jun 158168.5DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín de Córdoba Mendoza
Bishop Martín de Córdoba Mendoza O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopSan Pablo, Convent, Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 70, Number 406
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 186, and Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 178
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018