Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Dubravius (Skála z Doubravky a Hradiště)

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1486¹Born
27 Jun 154155.4AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
2 Jan 154256.0Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
6 Sep 155367.6DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Dubravius (Skála z Doubravky a Hradiště) (VIAF: 32032079)
Bishop Jan Dubravius (Skála z Doubravky a Hradiště) (born 1486, died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlzeň
Death PlaceKromĕříž

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1542, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast