Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar Amine Madi

Bishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1956 Born
14 Aug 198327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
14 Oct 200650.5AppointedBishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Nov 200650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Dec 200650.7InstalledBishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite), Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edgar Amine Madi
Bishop Edgar Amine Madi (born ) Bishop of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeit-Mery

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Nossa Senhora do Líbano em São Paulo (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017