Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Franquís Laso de Castilla

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1715³BornGranada
24 May 175641.1AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
16 Jun 175641.1Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
19 Sep 177459.4DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Franquís Laso de Castilla:
Bishop José de Franquís Laso de Castilla (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,474
  • 2fn/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 74, Number 363
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015