Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal de Lorraine-Vaudémont (II)

Deceased

Administrator of Toul, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinitŕ al Monte Pincio

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1561Born
21 Feb 157816.8Elevated to Cardinal
9 Mar 158018.8AppointedAdministrator of Toul, France
26 Dec 158322.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Jan 158523.7AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
24 Jun 158524.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
25 Nov 158625.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 158625.5Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
20 Apr 158726.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinitŕ al Monte Pincio
30 Oct 158726.5DiedAdministrator of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Lorraine-Vaudémont (II)
Charles Cardinal de Lorraine-Vaudémont (II) (born , died ) Administrator of Toul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNomeny, Diocese of Metz
Ordained PriestCathedral, Verdun, Diocese of Verdun
Ordained BishopCathedral, Verdun, Diocese of Verdun
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Cordeliers, Monastery, Nancy

  • a priest for .9 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
  • a cardinal for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1578
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 321
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018