Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Fournier, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Metz, France

Titular Bishop of Basilitanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532²Born
2 Aug 157442.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France
2 Aug 157442.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Basilitanus
13 May 157644.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basilitanus
25 Nov 161078.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Fournier
Bishop Antoine Fournier C.R.S.A. (born 1532, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReims, Archdiocese of Reims
Ordained BishopInfirmary, S. Victor, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceMetz, Diocese of Metz

  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 343, and Page 130
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast