Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Torres Altamirano, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1557¹BornTrujillo, Spain
26 Jun 161760.4AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
28 Oct 161861.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
10 Dec 162164.9DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Torres Altamirano:
Bishop Diego Torres Altamirano O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Cartagena

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 137, Number 873

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015