Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Lippomano

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497¹Born
23 Sep 153841.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bergamo, Italy
23 Sep 153841.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
29 Sep 1538³41.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
7 Feb 153942.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Verona, Italy
9 Aug 154851.6SucceededBishop of Verona, Italy
20 Jul 155861.5AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
15 Aug 155962.6DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Lippomano (VIAF: 64015323)
Bishop Luigi Lippomano (born 1497, died ) Bishop of Bergamo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331, and Page 251
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,806
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast