Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Oliviero Cardinal Carafa

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

Administrator of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1430BornRome
18 Nov 145828.7AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
29 Dec 145828.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
13 Jan 145928.8InstalledArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
18 Sep 146737.5Elevated to Cardinal
3 Dec 146737.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
5 Sep 147040.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
24 Jul 147646.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
31 Jan 148352.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
20 Sep 148454.5ResignedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Nov 149161.7AppointedAdministrator of Salamanca, Spain
23 Jun 149464.3ResignedAdministrator of Salamanca, Spain
31 Oct 149565.6AppointedAdministrator of Rimini, Italy
13 Sep 149767.5ResignedAdministrator of Rimini, Italy
2 Feb 150069.9AppointedAdministrator of Chieti, Italy
20 Dec 150171.8ResignedAdministrator of Chieti, Italy
4 Aug 150373.4AppointedAdministrator of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
29 Nov 150373.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
1 Apr 150575.1ResignedAdministrator of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
1506²75.8AppointedAdministrator of Caiazzo, Italy
9 Jul 150777.3ResignedAdministrator of Caiazzo, Italy
20 Aug 150777.4AppointedAdministrator of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
24 Apr 151080.1AppointedAdministrator of Tricarico, Italy
13 May 151080.2ResignedAdministrator of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
20 Jan 151180.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Oliviero Carafa:
Cardinal Oliviero Carafa (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 52.1 years
  • a cardinal for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 318, and Page 255
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,380
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,609

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013