Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Lippomano

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1557AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Verona, Italy
8 Jan 1557AppointedTitular Bishop of Maioren
6 Jun 1557Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maioren
20 Jul 1558SucceededBishop of Verona, Italy
16 Jul 1560DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Lippomano
Bishop Agostino Lippomano (died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Verona, Diocese of Verona
Death PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331, and Page 233
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast