Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Reymond

Deceased

Bishop of Dijon, France

Note/Previous Titular See: (Constitutionnel de L'Isère)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1737Born
Nov 179254.9AppointedBishop
13 Jan 179355.1Ordained BishopBishop
180163.1ResignedBishop
11 Apr 180264.4SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
2 May 180264.4ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
20 Feb 182082.2DiedBishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Reymond
Bishop Henri Reymond (born , died ) Bishop of Dijon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVienne

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018