Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Carlo Benedetti

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1674³BornTaranto
24 May 169823.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Nov 169824.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 172651.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Spoleto, Italy
3 Jun 172651.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
22 Jun 172652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
17 Mar 172752.7SucceededBishop of Spoleto, Italy
Sep 1739³65.2DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Carlo Benedetti:
Bishop Pietro Carlo Benedetti (born , died Sep 1739) Bishop of Spoleto

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,305
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 362, and Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015