Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccol˛ Laparelli

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1741BornCortona
4 Apr 177230.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cortona, Italy
23 Sep 180563.9AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
6 Oct 180563.9Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
23 Mar 180765.4AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
23 Sep 182179.9DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Laparelli:
Bishop Niccol˛ Laparelli (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 155, and Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013