Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Costanzo (Gasparo) Cardinal de Sarnano (Torri), O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vercelli, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1531Born
1542¹10.2EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
16 Nov 158655.1Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jan 158755.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
6 Apr 158755.5AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
20 Apr 158755.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
12 Jul 158755.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
29 May 158957.6ResignedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
20 Dec 159564.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Costanzo (Gasparo) de Sarnano (Torri) (VIAF: 27202669)
Costanzo (Gasparo) Cardinal de Sarnano (Torri) O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarnano
Ordained BishopS. Pietro in Montorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)San Francesco, Sarnano

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
  • a cardinal for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Nov 1586
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 5 Dec 2017