Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Langosco-Stroppiana

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1722BornVercelli
7 Apr 174926.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 177855.4SelectedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
20 Jul 177855.7ConfirmedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
26 Jul 177855.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
8 Nov 177856.0InstalledBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
13 Dec 178866.1DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Langosco-Stroppiana:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Langosco-Stroppiana (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 73
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 14 Dec 2013