Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Elio

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1506Born
17 Aug 154842.6AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
20 Jul 155852.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
156660.0ResignedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
30 Jul 157266.5AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
1576¹70.0DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Elio (VIAF: 88912038)
Patriarch Antonio Elio (born 1506, died 1576) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapodistria

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 276, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 216
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 26*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Jul 2018

Quantcast